|
09/19/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 394, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 4964.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 10. Page 6346.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6169.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on W., P. & W. and B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 3661.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3594.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 3122.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|