|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 615, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5060.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6196.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3615.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3205.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|