|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 27).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3661.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3595.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/18/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2. Page 3263.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Set for hearing April 24.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3034.) (March 28).
|
|
|
|
03/16/2012
|
Set for hearing March 28.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|