California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1272 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 12, 2012