|
09/29/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 793, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6119.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3397.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3230.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|