05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
04/30/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 30. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3264.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
03/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |