|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 3494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3445.) (May 7).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3306.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
03/30/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|