California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill June 15, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill March 26, 2012