California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1289 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill June 26, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012
Bill April 24, 2012