02/01/2012 | Died on the inactive file. | |||
06/02/2011 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Leno. | |||
04/07/2011 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/06/2011 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 559.) (April 5). | |||
03/31/2011 | Set for hearing April 5. (Vote only.) | |||
03/29/2011 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
03/18/2011 | Set for hearing March 29. | |||
03/15/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/11/2011 | Set for hearing March 22. | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
01/28/2011 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. | |||
01/27/2011 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |