|
09/21/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 435, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/21/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4762.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 12. Page 6069.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3302.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Set for hearing April 18.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|