05/24/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/25/2012 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3302.) | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/19/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/12/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
04/11/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/30/2012 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/29/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (March 27). | |||
03/09/2012 | Set for hearing March 27. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and ED. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |