|
09/25/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 570, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4980.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 2. Page 6459.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 6262.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3555.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/15/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3123.) (April 10).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|