California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1299 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2012

Amended

Bill June 12, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill April 16, 2012