01/31/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/04/2011 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 3. Page 849.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/29/2011 | Set for hearing May 4. | |||
04/27/2011 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/08/2011 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
01/20/2011 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
12/07/2010 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 6. | |||
12/06/2010 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |