05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/14/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3312.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |