|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 735, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4851.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 6184.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 13.)
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Corrected August 8.)
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3739.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. (Corrected May 30.) (Corrected May 31.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
From special consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3388.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3035.) (March 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|