06/19/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted. | |||
06/04/2012 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
05/25/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/25/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 3618.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/22/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/21/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3565.) (May 21). | |||
05/11/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/01/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3262.) (April 23). | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 23. | |||
03/29/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 16. | |||
03/26/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on E.Q. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |