|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 665, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4851.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6172.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6050.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5526.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3127.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3022.) (March 26).
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|