|
09/17/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 360, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/17/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4627.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5972.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E., R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3402.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3388.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3022.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing March 26.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|