|
09/21/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 302, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2153.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2595.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 17).
|
|
|
|
06/29/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1139.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|