|
09/28/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4900.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6213.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 3491.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3388.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3035.) (March 27).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|