|
08/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 214, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 28. Page 5898.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 3241.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3209.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|