07/09/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/09/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
06/28/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
06/25/2012 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |||
06/25/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5420.) Ordered to the Senate. | |||
06/15/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/14/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). | |||
05/10/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/03/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/03/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3403.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/10/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3034.) (March 28). | |||
03/16/2012 | Set for hearing March 28. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |