California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1317 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill May 3, 2012
Bill April 26, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012