|
08/25/2011
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2011
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2011
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2011
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1189.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 1085.) (May 23).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2011
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 850.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|