05/30/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/25/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 5. Page 3307.) | |||
04/17/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |