California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1327 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 23, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 30, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill July 3, 2012