07/03/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
05/30/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 3662.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
05/25/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3595.) (May 24). | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/07/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/27/2012 | Set for hearing May 7. | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 30. | |||
04/18/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3120.) (April 11). | |||
03/28/2012 | Set for hearing April 11. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |