|
08/01/2011
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2011.
|
|
|
|
08/01/2011
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/19/2011
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2342.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 6).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 904.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Set for hearing May 2.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 619.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Set for hearing April 12.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|