06/07/2012 | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Simitian. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/03/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3310.) (April 24). | |||
04/18/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/17/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/05/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/29/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 3035.) (March 27). | |||
03/21/2012 | Set for hearing March 27. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | |||
02/24/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. | |||
02/23/2012 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |