05/29/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
05/21/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 5. Page 3565.) | |||
05/16/2012 | Set for hearing May 21. | |||
05/14/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 0. Noes 3. Page 3514.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
04/30/2012 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3305.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/19/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/18/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
03/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |