|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 871, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 5420.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 6.) (June 18).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 3430.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3341.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3123.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
03/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|