|
02/02/2012
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
|
02/01/2012
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2885.) Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2011
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 52. Noes 27. Page 2686.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 566.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 358.) (March 16).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2011
|
Set for hearing March 16.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2011
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
|
|
|
|
01/27/2011
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|