California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1340 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Amended

Bill July 2, 2012
Bill June 20, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012