California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1341 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 22, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill June 13, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012