05/24/2012 | Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/18/2012 | Set for hearing May 24. | |||
05/14/2012 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2012 | Set for hearing May 14. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3205.) (April 17). | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
03/27/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |