|
07/03/2012
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5344.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3398.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3209.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|