04/04/2012 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
03/28/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/23/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/22/2012 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/19/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |