California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1355 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/07/2012

 BILL NUMBER: SB 1355AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 7, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 24, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Senator Runner FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Section 12813.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 1355, as amended, Runner. Vehicles: driver's licenses: veterans. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to issue driver's licenses to qualified individuals containing specified information  and to issue an identification card to any person attesting to the person's true full name, correct age, and other identifying data as certified by the applicant for the identification card  . This bill would require the department to include the designation "VETERAN" on a driver's license  or an identification card  issued to a veteran who requests the designation and provides proof of his or her military service and honorable discharge.  The bill would authorize the department to charge a fee of $29 for replacement of an unexpired driver's license or identification card with a new driver's license or identification card with a veteran's designation. The bill would also provide that applications for an original driver's license or identification card or the renewal of either are subject to the regular fees for issuance or renewal of the same.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12813.5 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 12813.5. (a) The department shall include the designation "VETERAN" on a driver's license  or identification card  issued to a veteran in an available space on the face of the driver's license  or identification card  if both of the following conditions are satisfied: (1) The veteran requests the designation. (2) The veteran provides proof, as determined by the department, of his or her military service and honorable discharge.  (b) (1) The department may charge a fee of twenty-nine dollars ($29) for replacement of an unexpired driver's license or identification card with a new driver's license or identification card with a veteran's designation. A replacement driver's license or identification card issued under this paragraph shall retain the expiration date of the driver's license or identification card that it replaces.   (2) An application for an original driver's license or an original identification card bearing the veteran's designation shall be subject to the regular fee authorized for the issuance of an original driver's license of the same class or the issuance of an original identification card. An application for the renewal of either a driver's license or an identification card bearing a veteran's designation shall be subject to the regular renewal fee authorized for the renewal of a driver's license of the same class or the regular renewal fee of an identification card.   (b)   (c)  As used in this section, "veteran" has the same meaning as that term is defined in Section 980 of the Military and Veterans Code.