|
08/16/2012
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3740.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 24).
|
|
|
|
05/22/2012
|
Set for hearing May 24.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2012
|
Set for hearing May 21.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2012
|
Set for hearing May 14.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3305.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2012
|
Set for hearing April 25.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 11.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|