California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1359 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2012
Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2012

Amended

Bill August 31, 2012
Bill August 24, 2012