LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1360
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1360
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1360
Compare Versions
SB1360 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1360 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB1360 Amended June 4, 2012
SB1360 Amended April 18, 2012
SB1360 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1360 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB1360 Chaptered September 7, 2012
SB1360 Enrolled August 22, 2012
SB1360 Amended June 4, 2012
SB1360 Amended April 18, 2012
SB1360 Amended April 9, 2012
SB1360 Introduced February 24, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare