LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1362
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB1362
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1362
Action History
04/09/2012
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
03/28/2012
Set for hearing April 11.
03/08/2012
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
02/27/2012
Read first time.
02/25/2012
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
02/24/2012
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.