05/21/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/24/2012 | Set, final hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 4. Page 3312.) | |||
04/20/2012 | Set for hearing April 24. | |||
04/17/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3209.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/09/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
03/29/2012 | Set for hearing April 17. | |||
03/28/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/21/2012 | Set for hearing April 10. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |