04/24/2012 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 6. Noes 7. Page 3263.) Reconsideration granted. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 3208.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |||
04/13/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
04/10/2012 | Set for hearing April 24 in G.O. pending receipt. | |||
04/09/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/29/2012 | Set for hearing April 9. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and G.O. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |