05/30/2012 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | |||
04/25/2012 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 5. Page 3307.) | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
04/17/2012 | Set for hearing April 25. | |||
04/16/2012 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
03/14/2012 | Set for hearing April 18. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |