|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 664, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4771.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6122.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 6003.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2012
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3207.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2012
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|