California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 7, 2012

Chaptered

Bill August 17, 2012

Amended

Bill June 11, 2012
Bill March 27, 2012