08/16/2012 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5974.) | |||
08/13/2012 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
08/13/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4469.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |||
08/07/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
08/06/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 4295.) (July 3). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |||
06/26/2012 | Set for hearing July 3. | |||
06/25/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/08/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/25/2012 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |